ND 4009 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution to create and enact a new section to article I of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to the inalienable right to life of every human being at every stage of development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The inalienable right to life of every human being at every stage of development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-25SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 03/25
2013-03-25SenateSigned by President
2013-03-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-03-25SenateReturned to Senate
2013-03-22HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 57 nays 35
2013-03-21HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 4 0
2013-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2013-02-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2013-02-08HouseReceived from Senate
2013-02-07SenateSecond reading, adopted yeas 26 nays 21
2013-02-06SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2013-02-06SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0
2013-01-29SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2013-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback