ND 2010 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly

Status

Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the insurance commissioner; to provide for making payments of insurance premiums tax collections to fire departments; to amend and reenact section 26.1-01-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the commissioner's salary; and to provide for reports to the budget section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The commissioner's salary; and to provide for reports to the budget section.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-20 Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
2011-05-20 Signed by Governor 05/09
2011-04-28 Signed by President
2011-04-11 Signed by Speaker
2011-04-08 Concurred
2011-04-06 Returned to Senate (12)
2011-04-06 Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 6 1
2011-03-10 Committee Hearing 08:30
2011-02-22 Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2011-02-16 Received from Senate
2011-02-15 Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2011-02-14 Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
2011-02-11 Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
2011-01-11 Committee Hearing 01:30
2011-01-04 Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback