ND HB1183 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 12 of section 54-52-01, section 54-52-06.4, subsection 3 of section 54-52-17, and subsection 4 of section 54-52-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a public employees retirement system retirement plan for peace officers; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Title
A public employees retirement system retirement plan for peace officers; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/18 |
2023-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor 04/18 |
2023-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 5 |
2023-04-12 | House | Concurred |
2023-04-10 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 32 nays 14 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 2 1 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:54 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:36 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:10 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to State and Local Government |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 7 |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 21 1 1 |
2023-02-17 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:41 |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee Hearing 04:00 |
2023-02-03 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-02-03 | House | Reported back, do pass 10 2 1 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-01-20 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Government and Veterans Affairs |