ND HB1085 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to federal funds reporting requirements by state agencies and reports to the legislative management; and to amend and reenact section 54-27-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to federal grant applications reporting requirements by state agency.
Title
Federal grant applications reporting requirements by state agency.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] | Sen. Dwight Cook [R] |
Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2015-04-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 15 |
2015-04-08 | House | Concurred |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-01-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 19 |
2015-01-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0 |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |