MN HF367 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Author added Kahn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Ranked-choice voting authorized; procedures for adoption, implementation, and use established.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ranked-choice voting authorized; procedures for adoption, implementation, and use established.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-31HouseAuthor added Kahn
2014-03-17HouseSecond reading
2014-03-17HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2013-02-28HouseSecond reading
2013-02-28HouseCommittee report, to pass as amended
2013-02-20HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2013-02-14HouseAuthors stricken Howe and Kelly
2013-02-11HouseAuthors added Bly, Freiberg, Rosenthal and Erhardt
2013-02-06HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback