MD SB778 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified raw foods and packaged foods that are entirely or partially produced with genetic engineering to display a specified label beginning on July 1, 2015; requiring a manufacturer to include a specified label on specified foods; requiring a supplier to include a specified label on a container used for packaging, holding, or transporting specified foods; requiring a retailer to place a specified label on a shelf or bin containing specified foods; etc.
Title
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] |
Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Agriculture
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Business Regulation and Occupations
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Courts
Damages
Environmental Health
Food
Genetics
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Industry and Technology
Labeling
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Business Regulation and Occupations
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Courts
Damages
Environmental Health
Food
Genetics
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Industry and Technology
Labeling
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards