MA H801 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to dogs brought into the Commonwealth by animal rescue organizations. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to dogs brought into the Commonwealth by animal rescue organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S497 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
H835 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Senate concurred
H2117 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
H2423 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
H835 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Senate concurred
H2117 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
H2423 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H801 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H801.pdf |