MA H4143 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a trust fund to promote environmental justice in the Office of the Attorney General. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing the Environmental Justice Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-10-16 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2023-10-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H792 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1979 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1979 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4143 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4143.pdf |