LA SCR68 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the attorney general to review the Office of Environmental Justice within the United States Department of Justice.
Title
Requests the attorney general to review the Office of Environmental Justice within the United States Department of Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on SCR 68 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1661) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 68 ADOPT (#1059) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 68 ADOPT (#1059) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-06-01 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |