LA HB89 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the number of employees in the registrar of voters office in certain parishes (EG +$1,204,920 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the number of employees in the registrar of voters office in certain parishes (EG +$1,204,920 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R] | Rep. Mike Bayham [R] | Rep. Beth Billings [R] | Rep. Ed Larvadain [D] |
Rep. Denise Marcelle [D] | Rep. John Wyble [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported favorably (10-1). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-02-16 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/16/2024. |
2024-02-15 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-02-15 | House | Prefiled. |