LA HB1076 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB373
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the Delta Agriculture Research and Sustainability District
Title
Provides for the Delta Agriculture Research and Sustainability District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 1076 FINAL PASSAGE (#888) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-09 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 373 reported by the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development (13-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB373 (Replaces) 2022-05-09 - Becomes HB 1076.