KY SB5 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on January 17 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-04-15 - Committee Substitute defeated
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 72.026 to increase the scope of mandatory coroner and medical examiner reporting in deaths involving Schedule I deaths; amend KRS 196.286 and 196.288 to direct that a portion of recaptured savings from criminal justice reforms be directed to funding of KY-ASAP; create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to specify the controlled substance treatment services to be offered under Medicaid; amend KRS 217.186 to increase the availability of Naloxone for use as a rescue drug for narcotic overdose situations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 218A to provide immunity for persons seeking emergency help in drug overdose situations; amend KRS 218A.040 to specify that death by overdose is a foreseeable result of the consumption or use of a Schedule I controlled substance; amend KRS 218A.1412 to establish a 50% minimum time service requirement for higher-level traffickers in heroin or methamphetamine, with the ability to deviate from that requirement in cases where the defendant provides assistance to the prosecution; amend KRS 439.3401 to require a minimum 50% time service requirement for homicide and fetal homicide offenders in situations where the decedent died due to a Schedule I drug overdose; amend KRS 501.060 to provide that it is not a defense to the establishment of causation in a Schedule I overdose case that the decedent voluntarily ingested the drug or that there was no direct contact between the decedent and the defendant; direct the Department of Criminal Justice Training to conduct regionalized heroin-specific in-service training for law enforcement officers by December 31, 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to controlled substances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-15HouseCommittee Substitute defeated
2014-04-15Housefloor amendment (4) ruled out of order
2014-04-15House3rd reading
2014-04-15Housefloor amendments (19) to HFA 18, (20) to HFA 16, (21-title) (22) to HFA 18, and (23-title) filed
2014-04-15Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 15, 2014
2014-04-15Housetaken from Rules (H)
2014-04-14Housefloor amendments (16) (17-title) and (18) filed
2014-03-28Housefloor amendments (10) (11) (12) (13) and (14) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (15-title) filed
2014-03-27Housefloor amendments (4) (6) and (8) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (5-title) (7-title) and (9-title) filed
2014-03-26Housefloor amendments (1) (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2014-03-26Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1) (2-title) and (3)
2014-03-25Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2014-03-25House2nd reading
2014-03-25Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2014-03-24Houseposted in committee
2014-03-24Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2014-03-24House1st reading
2014-03-24Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2014-03-17Houseposted in committee
2014-01-22Houseto Judiciary (H)
2014-01-17Housereceived in House
2014-01-16Senate3rd reading, passed 36-1
2014-01-16Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 16, 2014
2014-01-16Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2014-01-15Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2014-01-15Senate2nd reading
2014-01-15Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2014-01-14Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2014-01-14Senate1st reading
2014-01-14Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2014-01-13Senateto Judiciary (S)
2014-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5.htm
Texthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/bill.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HCS1.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HCA1.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HCA2.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HCA3.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA1.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA2.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA3.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA4.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA5.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA6.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA7.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA8.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA9.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA10.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA11.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA12.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA13.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA14.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA15.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA16.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA17.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA18.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA19.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA20.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA21.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA22.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HFA23.doc
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/LM.doc
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/CI.doc
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/vote_history.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HCS1LM.doc
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB5/HCS1CI.doc

Bill Comments

feedback