IL SB1709 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that names and information of people who have applied for or received Certificates of Firearm Registration are exempt from public inspections and copying. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the National Instant Criminal Background Check System Improvement Fund and the Illinois LEADS Information and Technology Improvement Fund. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Act. Provides that the Act may now be cited to as the "Firearm Owners Identification Card and Certificate of Firearm Registration Act". Defines "Certificate of Firearm Registration" and "firearm". Prohibits any person in the State from carrying or possessing a firearm without a Certificate of Firearm Registration. Sets forth requirements concerning exemptions, applications for registration, registration fees, the distribution of moneys received from certain fees, and the denial of an application. Creates penalties for the possession of a firearm without a current certificate of registration, knowingly providing false or misleading information or evidence in connection with an application, and the failure to report to local law enforcement that a registered firearm is lost, stolen, missing, or destroyed. Sets forth procedures for the return of a certificate of registration for a firearm that is lost, stolen, or otherwise disposed of. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOID-FIREARM REGISTRATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2013-04-29SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013
2013-04-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2013
2013-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013
2013-03-05SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2013-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2013-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2013-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.6Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-27.1AAmended CodeCitation Text
105534-8.05Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-120Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-45Amended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in pAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in partAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2026302.2Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.826New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.827New CodeSee Bill Text
301056z-98New CodeSee Bill Text
301056z-99New CodeSee Bill Text
410452Amended CodeCitation Text
430650.01Amended CodeCitation Text
430651Amended CodeCitation Text
430651.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4306514Amended CodeCitation Text
430653Amended CodeCitation Text
430653.1Amended CodeCitation Text
430653.4New CodeSee Bill Text
430654Amended CodeCitation Text
430656.1Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.2Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.3aAmended CodeCitation Text
720512-3.05Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-4Amended CodeCitation Text
720516C-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-30Amended CodeCitation Text
72052-7.1Amended CodeCitation Text
72052-7.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.6Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3.2Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3.4Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-9Amended CodeCitation Text
72064610Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-3Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-3.2Amended CodeCitation Text
74011012Amended CodeCitation Text
76510251Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback