CT SB00430 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate the minimum gas mileage requirement for cars and light duty trucks purchased as part of the state fleet, to extend by four years the deadline by which one hundred per cent of such vehicles shall be alternative-fueled, hybrid electric or plug-in electric vehicles and to expand the exemption from the mileage, fuel and emission standards to include all law enforcement or emergency response vehicles.
Title
An Act Concerning The State Fleet And Mileage, Fuel And Emission Standards, The Certification Of Minority Business Enterprises And Preference For A Bond Guaranty Program.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Charles Clemons [D] | Rep. Ernest Hewett [D] | Rep. Larry Butler [D] |
Rep. Bruce Morris [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Stephen Cassano [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 418 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 625 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 203 PASS (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 625 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 203 PASS (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-21 | House | Public Act 13-304 |
2013-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | House | Rules Suspended |
2013-06-05 | House | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8948 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | House Calendar Number 546 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-04-15 | Senate | File Number 477 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 360 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Environment |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/28 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |