CA AB612 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-08-27 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5374 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 1808.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter-party carriers of passengers: permit requirements: drivers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-25 - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-08-21 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB612 Nazarian By Hill (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Insurance (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - AB 612 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-27AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-08-25AssemblySet, first hearing. Motion "be concurred in" failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2014-08-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6316.)
2014-08-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2014-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4707.).
2014-08-19SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2014-08-04SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-07-02SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-23SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
2014-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2014-06-10SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
2014-06-05SenateRe-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and INS.
2014-06-04SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2014-06-03SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2014-05-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2013-07-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-06-25SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-06-18SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-05-23SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2013-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 1322.)
2013-05-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 29).
2013-04-22AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2013-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2013-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_612&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_bill_20130220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_bill_20130319_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_bill_20130220_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_bill_20130319_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_bill_20140529_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_bill_20140610_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_bill_20140619_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_bill_20140702_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_bill_20140819_amended_sen_v93.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_vote_20130429_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_vote_20130509_1019AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_vote_20140617_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_vote_20140804_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_vote_20140814_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_vote_20140821_0222PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_vote_20140825_000004_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_612_vote_20140825_000005_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback