CA AB1851 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 32247) to Chapter 2 of Part 19 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Drinking water: schoolsites: lead testing pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and ED. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 17. |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32247 | New Code | See Bill Text |