California Recently Introduced Bills
Browse Legislation - State Dashboard - View Trending
Bill | Summary | Last Action |
---|---|---|
ABX22 | An act to amend Sections 7360, 7362, 7363, and 7364 of, and to add Section 7374 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. | 2024-09-05 From printer. |
ABX21 | An act to amend Sections 25354.2, 25367, 25371, and 25372.2 of, to add Sections 25354.4 and 25354.6 to, and to repeal and add Section 25373 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to energy. | 2024-09-04 From printer. |
AR129 | Relative to the East Bay Regional Park District’s 90th anniversary. | 2024-08-29 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
AR128 | Relative to International Credit Union Day. | 2024-08-28 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
AR127 | Relative to January 6 Day of Remembrance and Reflection upon Democracy and American Ideals. | 2024-08-19 Introduced. |
AR126 | Relative to Title IX. | 2024-08-15 Introduced. |
AR125 | Relative to Aromatic L-Amino Acid Decarboxylase Deficiency Awareness Day. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. |
AR124 | Relative to California Promotoras Month. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. |
AR123 | Relative to Mahsa Amini Day. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. |
SR125 | Relative to Pain Awareness Month and Women In Pain Awareness Day. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5298.) |
SR124 | Relative to recognizing the United Mexican States’ First Woman President, Dr. Claudia Sheinbaum. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5077.) |
AR122 | Relative to California Firefighter Appreciation Month and California Firefighters Memorial Day. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. |
AR121 | Relative to boat people awareness. | 2024-08-19 Read. Adopted. |
AR120 | Relative to Blood Cancer Awareness Month. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. |
AR119 | Relative to National 4-H Week. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. |
SR123 | Relative to Salvadoran American Day. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5077.) |
SR122 | Relative to Childhood Cancer Awareness Month. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5079.) |
SR121 | Relative to Veteran Housing Insecurity Awareness Month. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5076.) |
SR120 | Relative to National Domestic Violence Awareness Month in California. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5298.) |
SR119 | Relative to Hanbok Day. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5298.) |
SR118 | Relative to Filipino American History Month. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5298.) |
AR118 | Relative to Childhood Cancer Awareness Month. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. |
AR117 | Relative to immigration. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. |
SR117 | Relative to the East Bay Regional Park District’s 90th anniversary. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5076.) |
SR116 | Relative to Taiwan. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5076.) |
SR115 | Relative to food and agriculture. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5075.) |
SR114 | Relative to President Joseph Biden. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 5075.) |
AR116 | Relative to the assassination attempt on former President Donald J. Trump. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. |
SR113 | Relative to Latina Equal Pay Day. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5075.) |
SR112 | Relative to universal school meals. | 2024-08-06 |
SR111 | Relative to California Life Sciences Month. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5074.) |
SCR170 | Relative to National Domestic Violence Awareness Month. | 2024-08-06 |
AR115 | Relative to Pakistani-American relations. | 2024-08-22 Read. Adopted. |
SR110 | Relative to Port Chicago 80th Anniversary. | 2024-08-12 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5041.) |
SR109 | Relative to Gold Star Mothers’ and Families’ Day. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5074.) |
SR108 | Relative to California Pickleball Day. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5073.) |
SR107 | Relative to Korean American Senior Day. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5069.) |
SCR169 | Relative to the Willie Mays Highway. | 2024-09-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2024. |
SR106 | Relative to Intellectual Property Awareness Month. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5068.) |
SR105 | Relative to Pakistani-American relations. | 2024-08-08 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5017.) |
ACR229 | Relative to Suicide Prevention Awareness Month. | 2024-08-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 198, Statutes of 2024. |
ACR228 | Relative to Women’s Equality Day. | 2024-08-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2024. |
ACR227 | Relative to Women in Animation. | 2024-08-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2024. |
ACR226 | Relative to Black Girl Joy Day. | 2024-08-30 Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Smallwood-Cuevas. |
SR104 | Relative to California-Mexico Advocacy Day. | 2024-08-15 Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5073.) |
SCR168 | Relative to Women’s Equality Day. | 2024-08-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2024. |
SCR167 | Relative to California Runaway and Homeless Youth Prevention Month. | 2024-08-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 185, Statutes of 2024. |
SCR166 | Relative to Islamophobia and anti-Palestinian hate. | 2024-07-03 |
AR114 | Relative to Kimchee Day. | 2024-08-08 Read. Adopted. |
AR113 | Relative to Transgender History Month. | 2024-08-08 Read. Adopted. |