AK SB75 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to an audiology and speech-language interstate compact; relating to the practice of audiology and the practice of speech-language pathology; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Aud. & Speech-lang Interstate Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clause(s) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-12 | House | FIN |
2023-05-12 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-05-11 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 75(FIN) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y18 N1 E1 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | PASSED Y11 N8 E1 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 75(FIN) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CAL |
2023-05-10 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2023-05-10 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-05-10 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/23 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON, KIEHL, MERRICK |
2023-04-19 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN |
2023-04-19 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE |
2023-03-29 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2023-03-29 | Senate | NR: MERRICK, BISHOP |
2023-03-29 | Senate | DP: BJORKMAN, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON |
2023-03-29 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP 2NR |
2023-02-17 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2023-02-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Compacts
Education
Employment
Fees
Health & Social Services
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Compacts
Education
Employment
Fees
Health & Social Services
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions