AK HB45 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to contributions from permanent fund dividends to the general and permanent funds.
Title
Pfd Contributions To General Fund And Pf
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-03 | House | FN1: (REV) |
2023-05-03 | House | NR: MCCABE, ALLARD, TILTON, CARPENTER |
2023-05-03 | House | DP: GRAY, MCKAY |
2023-05-03 | House | W&M RPT CS(W&M) NEW TITLE 2DP 4NR |
2023-04-28 | House | COSPONSOR REMOVED: MCCORMICK |
2023-04-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GROH |
2023-04-05 | House | ORTIZ, GRAY |
2023-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PATKOTAK, TILTON, SUMNER, CRONK, C.JOHNSON, SHAW, MCCORMICK, |
2023-03-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARRICK |
2023-02-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ALLARD, VANCE, RUFFRIDGE, FOSTER |
2023-02-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE |
2023-02-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): D.JOHNSON, STAPP, JOSEPHSON, STUTES, TOMASZEWSKI |
2023-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER, WRIGHT, MCKAY, COULOMBE |
2023-02-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER |
2023-01-25 | House | W&M, FIN |
2023-01-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB45 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0045A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0045B.PDF |