WY SJ0008 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-06 - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution by creating a new section authorizing the legislature to require school districts to impose a special tax on property within the school district for the purpose of construction of public school facilities; requiring voter approval of the facilities; providing for the legal effect of a negative vote; providing excess taxes are remitted to the state; and limiting the legislature's capital obligation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School construction and renovation- constitutional amendment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-06Senate3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
2017-02-03Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2017-02-02Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-01SenateCOW:Passed
2017-01-31SenatePlaced on General File
2017-01-31SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2017-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback