WY SJ0006 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor Signed SEJR No. 0004
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION creating awareness of Tardive Dyskinesia and designating the first full week of May as Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Governor Signed SEJR No. 0004
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed SEJR No. 0004
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed SEJR No. 0004
2019-02-26 Assigned Number SEJR No. 0004
2019-02-25SenateConcur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2019-02-25SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25House3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-21HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-21HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2019-01-24Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-23SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-22SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-22SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-01-16SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback