WY SJ0006 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 11 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (H) Speaker Signed SEJR. No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to limit air quality regulation by the United States Environmental Protection Agency (EPA).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution-environmental protection agency regulations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-15 (H) Speaker Signed SEJR. No. 0001
2011-02-15 (S) President Signed SEJR No. 0001
2011-02-14 Assigned Number SEJR0001
2011-02-14 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Scott Ayes 29 Nays 1 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-14 (S) Did Concur
2011-02-14 (S) Received for Concurrence
2011-02-11 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Craft, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Goggles, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Byrd and Connolly. Excused: Representative(s) Davison, Gay, Greear and Shepperson. Ayes 54 Nays 2 Excused 4 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-11 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-11 Amendment Failed
2011-02-10 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-10 Amendment Adopted
2011-02-09 (H) Passed CoW
2011-02-09 Amendment Adopted
2011-02-09 (H) Amendments Adopted
2011-02-07 (H) Placed on General File
2011-02-07 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Greear, Kasperik, Lockhart, Moniz, Stubson and Zwonitzer, Dv. Nayes: Representative(s) Byrd, Roscoe and Zwonitzer, Dn. Ayes 6 Nays 3 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-07 (H09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-02-01 (H) Introduced and Referred to H09
2011-01-28 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-26 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Case, Hastert and Rothfuss. Ayes 27 Nays 3 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-26 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-25 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-25 Amendment Adopted
2011-01-24 (S) Passed CoW
2011-01-24 Amendment Adopted
2011-01-24 (S) Amendments Adopted
2011-01-21 (S) Placed on General File
2011-01-21 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Bebout, Coe, Cooper and Jennings Nayes: Senator(s) Rothfuss Ayes 4 Nays 1 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-21 (S09) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-20 (S) Rereferred to S09
2011-01-19 (S) Placed on General File
2011-01-19 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Bebout, Coe, Cooper and Jennings Nayes: Senator(s) Rothfuss Ayes 4 Nays 1 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-19 (S09) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-11 (S) Introduced and Referred to S09
2011-01-11 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback