WY SJ0005 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - No report prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - No report prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress and Wyoming’s Congressional delegation to endorse use of health savings accounts and reinsurance programs to promote individual choice in health care; to support federal legislation lifting impediments and endowing states with authority to establish health care cost and saving mechanisms; to encourage application for a state innovation waiver of Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act requirements; and to promote health care billing transparency protocols.
Title
Promoting individual choice in health care.
Sponsors
Sen. Curt Meier [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2018-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-21 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 27-1-2-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |