WY SJ0005 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (H) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution by creating a new section specifying that a marriage between a man and a woman shall be the only domestic legal union that shall be valid or recognized in Wyoming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defense of marriage-constitutional amendment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-08 (H) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
2011-02-08 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel, Brown, Cannady, Krone, Nicholas B and Peasley Nayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Greene and Throne Ayes 6 Nays 3 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-08 (H01) Recommended Do Pass
2011-02-03 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2011-01-28 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-27 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Geis, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Meier, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross and Scott. Nays: Senator(s) Burns, Case, Christensen, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Martin, Nicholas P, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Von Flatern. Ayes 20 Nays 10 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-27 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-26 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-26 Amendment Adopted
2011-01-25 (S) Passed CoW
2011-01-25 Amendment Adopted
2011-01-25 Amendment Failed
2011-01-24 (S) Laid Back Pursuant to SR 10-4(a)
2011-01-24 Amendment Adopted
2011-01-24 (S) Amendments Adopted
2011-01-21 (S) Placed on General File
2011-01-21 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Christensen, Hicks and Perkins Nayes: Senator(s) Burns and Esquibel, F. Ayes 3 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-21 (S01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-14 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2011-01-11 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback