WY SJ0003 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor Signed SEJR No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION recognizing December 10, 2019 as Wyoming Women's Suffrage Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming's Women Suffrage Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13 Governor Signed SEJR No. 0001
2019-02-11HouseSpeaker Signed SEJR No. 0001
2019-02-08SenatePresident Signed SEJR No. 0001
2019-02-08 Assigned Number SEJR No. 0001
2019-02-07SenateConcur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2019-02-07SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-07House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2019-02-06House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-05HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-05HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-05HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2019-01-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-01-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-18SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-17SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-17SenateS06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2019-01-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback