WY SJ0002 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION recognizing United States Senator and Wyoming Governor and Secretary of State Lester Calloway Hunt as a consummate model to public servants for his distinguished career, his commendable civility and courage and his service to Wyoming and the United States of America.
Title
Recognizing the service of Lester C. Hunt.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Stith [R] | Rep. Mike Yin [D] | Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2023-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-16 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2023-01-30 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-30 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-1-0-0 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-20 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |