WY SJ0002 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - (H) Placed on General File; Did not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - (H) Placed on General File; Did not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to provide for increased monitoring and funding for remediation of the Riverton uranium mill tailings remediation site.
Title
Riverton uranium mill tailings remedial action.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | (H) Placed on General File; Did not Consider in COW | |
2012-03-02 | (H09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H09 | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-27 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-20 | (S09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S09 | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |