WY SJ0001 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Governor Signed SEJR No. 0003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution by recognizing and preserving the heritage of Wyoming citizens' opportunity to fish, hunt and trap wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Right to hunt, fish and trap.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-03 Governor Signed SEJR No. 0003
2011-03-01 (H) Speaker Signed SEJR No. 0003
2011-02-28 (S) President Signed SEJR No. 0003
2011-02-28 Assigned Number SEJR No. 0003
2011-02-28 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-25 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-24 (H) Passed CoW
2011-02-16 (H) Placed on General File
2011-02-16 (H06) Recommended Do Pass
2011-02-07 (H) Introduced and Referred to H06
2011-02-07 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-02-04 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-03 (S) Laid Back Pursuant to SR 10-4(a)
2011-02-02 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-01 (S) Passed CoW
2011-01-25 (S) Placed on General File
2011-01-25 (S06) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-11 (S) Introduced and Referred to S06
2011-01-11 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-12-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback