WY SF1019 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming gaming commission; providing legislative findings; correcting a scrivener's error in previous legislation; demonstrating legislative intent to secure uninterrupted membership under the Wyoming retirement system for specified Wyoming gaming commission personnel; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming gaming commission-scrivener error correction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-9-1-0-1 (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 16-12-1-0-1 (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 16-12-1-0-1 (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | House | Did Not Consider for Introduction |
2021-10-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-10-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 19-9-1-0-1 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-10-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-10-27 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 16-12-1-0-1 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-10-21 | Bill Number Assigned |