WY SF0167 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 128 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 128 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to worker's compensation; modifying the rate discount for compliance with a drug and alcohol testing program as specified; providing for an experience modification rate for out of state employers moving operations to Wyoming as specified; providing a premium credit for employers as specified; providing for rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Worker's compensation-rate discount, modification & credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Steve Harshman [R] |
Rep. David Miller [R] | Rep. Patrick Sweeney [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 128 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0054 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0054 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0054 |
2017-02-27 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0054 | |
2017-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 |
2017-02-24 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-16 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2017-02-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-27 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |