WY SF0165 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school finance; making temporary and permanent reductions and contingent further modifications to education funding; creating a select committee on school finance recalibration as specified; limiting transportation expenditures; authorizing Medicaid reimbursement for special education purposes as specified; providing appropriations; modifying previous appropriations; providing rulemaking authority; providing applicability; and providing for effective dates.
Title
School finance-education funding reductions.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Bruce Burns [R] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Did Not Consider in COW |
2017-02-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-27 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-24 | House | Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-02-24 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2017-02-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-02 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2017-02-01 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |