WY SF0164 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cities and towns; amending requirements for contracts for public improvements for municipalities; amending requirements for the purchase or trade of property by cities and towns; amending the guarantees required for public improvement contracts; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public improvement contract requirements-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-2-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-4-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-4-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 171 | |
2023-03-09 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0087 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0087 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0087 |
2023-03-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0087 | |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-0-2-0-0 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2023-03-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-4-1-0-0 |
2023-02-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-22 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2023-02-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-31 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | :Refer to S08 - Transportation |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |