WY SF0158 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to license plates; providing that front license plates need not be displayed under specified circumstances; establishing fees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Front license plates.
Sponsors
Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] | Sen. John Hastert [D] | Rep. John Freeman [D] | Rep. Matthias Greene [R] |
Rep. Tom Reeder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and referred to S08; No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/SF0158.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/SF0158.pdf |