WY SF0155 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to homeland security; specifying additional limitations on the exercise of powers related to homeland security and states of emergency concerning firearms; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Limiting firearm seizure and regulation during emergencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Assigned Chapter Number 106 | |
2021-04-05 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0040 | |
2021-04-01 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0040 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0040 |
2021-04-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0040 | |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-23 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-05 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-01 | Bill Number Assigned |