WY SF0154 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to counties; providing for the establishment of solid waste disposal districts at the request of tribal governments; providing for the nomination and appointment of the governing board of those solid waste disposal districts; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tribal solid waste disposal district.
Sponsors
Sen. Cale Case [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-31 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |