WY SF0153 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - 3rd Reading:Failed 11-17-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to municipalities, counties and joint powers boards; amending the authority of specified entities to make loans to property owners for energy improvements; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy improvement program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 11-17-2-0-0 (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04Senate3rd Reading:Failed 11-17-2-0-0
2019-02-01Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-31SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-29SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-29SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback