WY SF0152 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-25 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-25 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to offenses by public officials; creating a misdemeanor offense for public officers and public servants overspending or transferring an appropriation as specified; providing a penalty; providing for discharge from employment as specified; providing exceptions; granting rulemaking authority; providing instruction to the department of health if claims exceed appropriations; providing for reports; repealing redundant provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Overspending budgets-penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Scott [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Philip Nicholas [R] | Sen. Tony Ross [R] |
Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Rep. Steve Harshman [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-04 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S12 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S12 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S12 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S12 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | Died In Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H12 |
2013-02-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-31 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |