WY SF0151 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the judiciary; increasing judicial salaries as specified; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Judicial salary increases.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Shelly Duncan [R] | Rep. Dan Kirkbride [R] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] |
Rep. Patrick Sweeney [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] | Rep. Art Washut [R] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] |
Sen. Drew Perkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-17-5-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 98 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0040 | |
2019-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0040 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0040 |
2019-02-15 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0040 | |
2019-02-15 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 38-17-5-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-13 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-12 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-01 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |