WY SF0150 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the department of health; authorizing the department of health to carry out health care innovation studies; creating an account; providing a waiver from procurement requirements; authorizing the department of health to waive existing rules as necessary to conduct innovative studies; authorizing the adoption of rules; clarifying a definition; making an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care innovation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-0-2-0-1 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-0-0-1 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 175
2019-03-08 Governor Signed SEA No. 0073
2019-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0073
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0073
2019-02-27 Assigned Number SEA No. 0073
2019-02-27SenateConcur:Passed 27-0-2-0-1
2019-02-27SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-14HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-02-13HouseS10 - Labor:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-02-13HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-08HouseH10 - Labor:Rerefer to H03 - Revenue
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-0-0-1
2019-02-04Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-01SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-29SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-29SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-25SenateS10 - Labor:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-25SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback