WY SF0149 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to oil and gas; establishing an exemption for the reduction of certain oil and gas severance taxes based on royalty rates; specifying procedures for the tax exemption; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Oil and gas-royalty and tax rates.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Edward Cooper [R] |
Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - COW:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | COW:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-09 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-01 | Bill Number Assigned |