WY SF0145 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state lands; requiring the game and fish commission to enter into an agreement to reimburse the board of land commissioners for specified uses of state trust lands; requiring the purchase of a recreation permit to access state trust lands with specified exceptions; providing that recreation permit revenues shall benefit state trust land beneficiaries; providing funding for the game and fish commission access fund; providing procedures for the sale of recreation permits; creating a criminal penalty; requiring the adoption of rules; specifying applicability; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State trust land revenues.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateS:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2019-02-01SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2019-01-28Senate:Rerefer to S04 - Education
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback