WY SF0144 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - 3rd Reading:Failed 20-39-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to welfare; requiring Medicaid recipients to comply with specified work or volunteer requirements as a condition of continuing eligibility; providing exceptions; requiring the department of health to apply for a federal waiver relating to work or volunteer requirements; prohibiting specified actions relating to the supplemental nutrition assistance program; specifying federal waiver requirements relating to child care and Medicaid; requiring rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid and SNAP eligibility requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 20-39-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - House - COW:Passed 30-28-2-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-5-2-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27House3rd Reading:Failed 20-39-1-0-0
2019-02-26House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22HouseCOW:Passed 30-28-2-0-0
2019-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-20HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0
2019-02-15HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-14HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-04Senate3rd Reading:Passed 23-5-2-0-0
2019-02-01Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-31SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-29SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-29SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback