WY SF0144 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; modifying procurement requirements for expenditures for capital construction projects through the remainder of the fiscal biennium; modifying and specifying preference requirements; providing for waivers of the requirements; authorizing modifications by executive order; providing for further study; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State funded construction projects/preference provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Rosie Berger [R] | Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Sen. John Hastert [D] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] |
Sen. Philip Nicholas [R] | Rep. Bryan Pedersen [R] | Sen. Ray Peterson [R] | Rep. William Steward [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-03-02 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0067 | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0067 | |
2011-02-25 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0067 | |
2011-02-25 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0067 | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Did Concur | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-07 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-04 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-03 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-02 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S02 | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |