WY SF0143 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; requiring passage of an examination on the principles of the constitutions of the United States and the state of Wyoming to receive a high school diploma or high school equivalency certificate; specifying examination requirements and composition; providing legislative findings; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civics proficiency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Senate - S04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-01-28SenateS04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback