WY SF0143 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health insurance; providing for the administration of the child health insurance program by the department of family services; providing for the transfer of positions, property, personnel and funds associated with the program to the department of family services; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Child health insurance program management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2017-02-03 | Senate | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Digest/SF0143.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Introduced/SF0143.pdf |
Supplement | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Fiscal/SF0143.pdf |