WY SF0142 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to counties; prohibiting counties from eliminating livestock grazing on public or private lands as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County regulation of livestock grazing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Assigned Chapter Number 165
2019-02-28 Governor Signed SEA No. 0063
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0063
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0063
2019-02-26 Assigned Number SEA No. 0063
2019-02-25SenateConcur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2019-02-25SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25House3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-14HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2019-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-04Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-01SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-30SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback