WY SF0142 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Chapter No. 149 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to fire protection; restricting the interpretation or enforcement of building codes or standards as specified; specifying the application of certain building codes; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building code regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-16-2-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-16-2-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed by roll call 24- (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed by roll (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 12-15-3-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 12-15-3-0 (Y: 12 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-10 Chapter No. 149 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-10 Governor Signed SEA No. 0054
2015-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0054
2015-03-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0054
2015-03-02 Assigned Number SEA No. 0054
2015-03-02SenateConcur:Passed 19-11-0-0-0
2015-02-27SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 42-16-2-0-0
2015-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-23HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-23 Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2015-02-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-02-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0
2015-02-05Senate3rd Reading:Failed 12-15-3-0-0
2015-02-04Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-03SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-03SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-03 Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-29SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2015-01-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback