WY SF0141 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to civil procedure; authorizing business entities to represent themselves in forcible entry and detainer actions; specifying requirements and exceptions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Business entities-representation in detainer cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Pursuant to HR 7-7 Accelerated to 3rd Reading 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Pursuant to HR 7-7 Accelerated to 3rd Reading 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Assigned Chapter Number 143 | |
2021-04-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0071 | |
2021-04-06 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0071 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0071 |
2021-04-06 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0071 | |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2021-04-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 |
2021-04-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Pursuant to HR 7-7 Accelerated to 3rd Reading 58-1-1-0-0 |
2021-04-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-29 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2021-03-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-22 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-01 | Bill Number Assigned |