WY SF0141 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 180 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 180 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; specifying accounts from which state budget recommendations may be directed; specifying statutory budget reserve amounts apply to supplemental and emergency budgets; specifying that agency budget requests and other resources shall be utilized to interpret and implement provisions of the appropriations bill as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State budget development.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Nicholas [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] | Sen. Tony Ross [R] |
Rep. Rosie Berger [R] | Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. Tim Stubson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-0-3-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-0-3-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-0-3-0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-0-3-0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-0-3-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-0-3-0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-0-3-0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Chapter No. 180 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0088 | |
2015-03-06 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0088 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0088 |
2015-03-06 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0088 | |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Concur:Passed 27-0-3-0-0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-03-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 |
2015-03-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-03-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-27 | Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-0-3-0-0 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-03 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-28 | Bill Number Assigned |