WY SF0141 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; modifying definition of toxic substance for purposes of the offense of unlawful use of a toxic substance; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Unlawful use of toxic substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-30 - Senate - S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 7 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-25 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | Senate | Failed CoW; Indef Postponed |
2013-01-30 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/SF0141.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/SF0141.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/SF0141.htm |